Senate | 05/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 525 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6955 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 336 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/24 |