Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-210
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 554
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
File Number 350
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 256
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|