LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00651
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00651
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2015 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00651
Action History
Senate
04/08/2015
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
Senate
04/07/2015
Drafted by Committee
Senate
03/27/2015
Vote to Draft
Senate
03/12/2015
Public Hearing 03/16
Senate
02/11/2015
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing