Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Aging | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 149 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 144 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |