Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | File Number 134 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 131 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Vote to Draft |