Senate | 04/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 479 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6305 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | File Number 489 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 300 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |