Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 650 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | File Number 46 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 91 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Vote to Draft |