Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9233
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House Calendar Number 672
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8367
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
File Number 804
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 491
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|