Senate | 06/04/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Public Act 15-26 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 527 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 337 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 241 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |