LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00813
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00813
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2015 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00813
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 26, 2015
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 22, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 13, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 28, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2015
Compare