Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00822 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/26/2015

                            General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 822
January Session, 2015  LCO No. 2579
 *02579*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist. SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist.

General Assembly

Proposed Bill No. 822 

January Session, 2015

LCO No. 2579

*02579*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.

SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist.

AN ACT CONCERNING THE EXCESS COST THRESHOLD FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

That (1) section 10-76g of the general statutes be amended to revise the excess cost threshold for special education as follows: (A) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, the excess cost threshold shall be the net current expenditures per pupil for the prior fiscal year multiplied by three and one-half, (B) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, the excess cost threshold shall be the net current expenditures per pupil for the prior fiscal year multiplied by three, (C) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, the excess cost threshold shall be the net current expenditures per pupil for the prior fiscal year multiplied by two and one-half, and (D) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, and each fiscal year thereafter, the excess cost threshold shall be the net current expenditures per pupil for the prior fiscal year multiplied by two, and (2) title 10 of the general statutes be amended to require the Department of Education to annually (A) collect data relating to the per pupil special education expenditures by each local and regional board of education, and (B) report such data to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education.

Statement of Purpose: 

To phase in a change to the excess cost threshold for special education and to require the Department of Education to annually collect data relating to local special education expenditures.