Senate | 06/02/2015 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 255 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 203 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |