Senate | 03/24/2015 | File Number 199 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 166 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |