Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Public Act 15-27
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 528
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6874
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
File Number 150
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 149
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|