Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-232
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
House Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6051
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
File Number 47
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 84
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|