Senate | 04/30/2015 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | File Number 612 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Public Hearing 02/06 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |