Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 663
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7814
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 703
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
New File by Committee on Banking
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Banking
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
File Number 49
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|