Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-91
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6418
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6385
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
File Number 93
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 124
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|