Senate | 05/12/2015 | No Action | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 553 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 322 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |