Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Public Act 15-105
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Calendar Number 591
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7630
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
File Number 95
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 114
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|