Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-92
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 613
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7614
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
File Number 97
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 116
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|