Senate | 06/02/2015 | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9191 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House Calendar Number 614 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | File Number 51 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 93 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |