Senate | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Public Act 15-73 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Calendar Number 592 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | File Number 52 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 87 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |