Senate | 04/28/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 152 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 154 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |