Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 153 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 155 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |