Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 651
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8087
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
File Number 135
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 136
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|