Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | File Number 136 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 137 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |