Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 652 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6827 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 258 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 188 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |