Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00889 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 889
22 January Session, 2015 LCO No. 3422
3- *_____SB00889PD____041415____*
3+ *_____SB00889HSG___021915____*
44 Referred to Committee on HOUSING
55 Introduced by:
66 (HSG)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 889
1111
1212 January Session, 2015
1313
1414 LCO No. 3422
1515
16-*_____SB00889PD____041415____*
16+*_____SB00889HSG___021915____*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on HOUSING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HSG)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE URBAN REVITALIZATION PROGRAM.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 8-208c of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2015):
2929
3030 (a) The Commissioner of Housing shall, within existing resources of the department, establish an urban revitalization [pilot] program to foster the revitalization and stabilization of urban neighborhoods by facilitating the acquisition and renovation of one-to-four family homes and prioritizing owner-occupancy of such homes. Such program shall be implemented in one or more distressed municipalities, as defined in section 32-9p. The commissioner may contract with one or more state-wide nonprofit organizations to administer the program.
3131
3232 (b) The goal of the program shall be to increase homeownership in targeted neighborhoods containing high proportions of one-to-four family homes, giving priority to promoting owner-occupancy in buildings that are for sale, vacant, deteriorated, in foreclosure, bank-owned or investor-owned. The program administrator shall target neighborhoods in which concentrated resources can have a substantial impact on revitalizing and stabilizing the surrounding community. The program administrator shall recruit community stakeholders to provide active support for the program, including local banks, local boards of realtors, neighborhood revitalization zone committees, community-based organizations, community development financial institutions and similar entities. The program administrator shall, as necessary to accomplish program goals:
3333
3434 (1) Draw on diverse public and private funding sources and programs, including foundations, local loan funds and programs administered by departments or agencies other than the Department of Housing, including the Connecticut Housing Finance Authority, and use public funds to leverage private resources;
3535
3636 (2) Provide financing or investment to support property purchase, rehabilitation, construction, demolition, energy efficiency and aesthetic improvements, including provision of financial products that promote homeownership, such as down payment assistance, and identify other financial resources to support such activities;
3737
3838 (3) Offer incentives to investors to develop tenants into owners, apply income restrictions to housing units in order to ensure affordability, and conduct energy efficiency improvements in order to meet weatherization goals;
3939
4040 (4) Identify and coordinate access for program participants to rental assistance and foreclosure prevention resources and to other resources that will increase homeownership, stabilize or decrease occupancy costs and stabilize neighborhoods;
4141
4242 (5) Provide assistance to individuals who are or who will become homeowners and to nonprofit and for-profit entities that will purchase and rehabilitate properties to sell to individuals who will become homeowners;
4343
4444 (6) Provide support services for program participants who are or who will become homeowners so as to maximize the likelihood of their success in maintaining homeownership on a long-term basis, including training in skills necessary to be an effective landlord and assistance in resolving problems that may arise after closing on a home;
4545
4646 (7) Identify and structure incentives to encourage participation in the program by lenders, investors and developers with a goal of promoting homeownership; and
4747
4848 (8) Assist program participants in locating purchase financing and counseling before and after any purchase and direct such participants to programs that provide deferred, low or no interest or forgivable loans, including the Rental Housing Revolving Loan Fund established pursuant to section 8-37vv.
4949
5050 (c) Any person who receives assistance through the program established by this section to purchase a home shall agree (1) to occupy such home or a unit in such home as such person's primary residence for not less than five years, or (2) to transfer such home to a person who will agree to occupy such home or a unit in such home as such person's primary residence for not less than five years. Priority for participation in the program may be given to persons who will become first-time homebuyers and to persons who are living in a neighborhood targeted by the program.
5151
5252 (d) [The Commissioner of Housing shall establish the parameters of the program not later than October 1, 2012, and shall designate one or more municipalities to participate in the program not later than January 1, 2013. The commissioner, in accordance with section 11-4a, shall submit the following to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to housing: (1) A status report on the program not later than February 1, 2013; (2) an interim report on the program not later than January 1, 2014; and (3) a final report on the program not later than January 1, 2015.] On or before January 1, 2016, and biannually thereafter, the Commissioner of Housing, in accordance with section 11-4a, shall submit a report on the program to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to housing.
5353
5454
5555
5656
5757 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5858 Section 1 October 1, 2015 8-208c
5959
6060 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
6161
6262 Section 1
6363
6464 October 1, 2015
6565
6666 8-208c
6767
6868
6969
7070 HSG Joint Favorable
71-PD Joint Favorable
7271
7372 HSG
74-
75-Joint Favorable
76-
77-PD
7873
7974 Joint Favorable