Senate | 04/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 483 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | File Number 32 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 80 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |