Senate | 06/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Public Act 15-36 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 557 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | File Number 66 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 103 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |