Senate | 03/04/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |