Senate | 05/19/2015 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | File Number 211 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 175 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |