Senate
|
07/10/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-246
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 679
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8591
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
File Number 68
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 105
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|