Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Public Act 15-8 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | House Calendar Number 354 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | File Number 100 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 127 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |