Senate | 07/02/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/16/2015 | Public Act 15-187 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House Calendar Number 616 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 154 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 153 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |