Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Calendar Number 680
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6473
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 260
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 206
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|