Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | File Number 295 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 227 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |