Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-93
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8349
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8341
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 631
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 7828
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8038
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Recalled E 8038
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule E 8038
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7870
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7903
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7933
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7725
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
File Number 338
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 238
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|