Senate | 06/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Public Act 15-86 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8643 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 532 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 261 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 207 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |