Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Public Act 15-9 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 485 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | File Number 657 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 371 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |