Senate | 04/01/2015 | File Number 352 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 258 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |