Senate | 05/22/2015 | House Calendar Number 618 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 339 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 248 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |