Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00945 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Governor's Bill No. 945
22 January Session, 2015 LCO No. 3826
33 *03826__________*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist. SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist. REP. SHARKEY, 88th Dist. REP. ARESIMOWICZ, 30th Dist.
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Governor's Bill No. 945
1111
1212 January Session, 2015
1313
1414 LCO No. 3826
1515
1616 *03826__________*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 SEN. LOONEY, 11th Dist.
2323
2424 SEN. DUFF, 25th Dist.
2525
2626 REP. SHARKEY, 88th Dist.
2727
2828 REP. ARESIMOWICZ, 30th Dist.
2929
3030 AN ACT CONCERNING THE TAX EXEMPT STATUS OF CERTAIN HOSPITAL FACILITIES.
3131
3232 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
3333
3434 Section 1. Section 12-20a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date):
3535
3636 (a) On or before January first, annually, the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall determine the amount due to each municipality in the state, in accordance with this section, as a state grant in lieu of taxes with respect to real property owned by any (1) private nonprofit institution of higher learning, [or any] (2) nonprofit general hospital facility [or] that is operated in the same location as an emergency department or federally-qualified health center, (3) freestanding chronic disease hospital, or [an] (4) urgent care facility that operates for at least twelve hours a day and that had been the location of a nonprofit general hospital for at least a portion of calendar year 1996 to receive payments in lieu of taxes for such property, exclusive of any such facility operated by the federal government, except a campus of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs Connecticut Healthcare Systems, or the state of Connecticut or any subdivision thereof. As used in this section "private nonprofit institution of higher learning" means any such institution, as defined in subsection (a) of section 10a-34, or any independent institution of higher education, as defined in subsection (a) of section 10a-173, that is engaged primarily in education beyond the high school level, and offers courses of instruction for which college or university-level credit may be given or may be received by transfer, the property of which is exempt from property tax under any of the subdivisions of section 12-81, as amended by this act; "nonprofit general hospital facility" means any such facility that is used primarily for the purpose of general medical care and treatment, exclusive of any hospital facility used primarily for the care and treatment of special types of disease or physical or mental conditions; and "freestanding chronic disease hospital" means a facility that provides for the care and treatment of chronic diseases, excluding any such facility having an ownership affiliation with and operated in the same location as a chronic and convalescent nursing home.
3737
3838 (b) The grant payable to any municipality under the provisions of this section in the state fiscal year commencing July 1, 1999, and in each fiscal year thereafter, shall be equal to seventy-seven per cent of the property taxes which, except for any exemption applicable to any such institution of higher education or general hospital facility that is operated in the same location as an emergency department or federally-qualified health center under the provisions of section 12-81, as amended by this act, would have been paid with respect to such exempt real property on the assessment list in such municipality for the assessment date two years prior to the commencement of the state fiscal year in which such grant is payable. The amount of the grant payable to each municipality in any year in accordance with this section shall be reduced proportionately in the event that the total of such grants in such year exceeds the amount appropriated for the purposes of this section with respect to such year.
3939
4040 (c) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (b) of this section, the amount of the grant payable to any municipality under the provisions of this section with respect to a campus of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs Connecticut Healthcare Systems shall be as follows: (1) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2007, twenty per cent of the amount payable in accordance with said subsection (b); (2) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008, forty per cent of such amount; (3) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009, sixty per cent of such amount; (4) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2010, eighty per cent of such amount; (5) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011, and each fiscal year thereafter, one hundred per cent of such amount.
4141
4242 (d) As used in this section and section 12-20b, the word "municipality" means any town, consolidated town and city, consolidated town and borough, borough, district, as defined in section 7-324, and any city not consolidated with a town.
4343
4444 Sec. 2. Subdivision (16) of section 12-81 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date):
4545
4646 (16) Subject to the provisions of section 12-88, [all] the property of, or held in trust for, any Connecticut hospital society or corporation or sanatorium where a nonprofit general hospital facility, as defined in section 12-20a, as amended by this act, is operated in the same location as an emergency department or federally-qualified health center, provided (A) no officer, member or employee thereof receives or, at any future time, shall receive any pecuniary profit from the operations thereof, except reasonable compensation for services in the conduct of its affairs, and (B) in 1967, and quadrennially thereafter, a statement shall be filed by such hospital society, corporation or sanatorium on or before the first day of November with the assessor or board of assessors of any town, consolidated town and city or consolidated town and borough, in which any of its property claimed to be exempt is situated. Such statement shall be filed on a form provided by such assessor or board of assessors;
4747
4848
4949
5050
5151 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5252 Section 1 October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date 12-20a
5353 Sec. 2 October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date 12-81(16)
5454
5555 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5656
5757 Section 1
5858
5959 October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date
6060
6161 12-20a
6262
6363 Sec. 2
6464
6565 October 1, 2015, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after said date
6666
6767 12-81(16)
6868
6969 Statement of Purpose:
7070
7171 To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
7272
7373 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]