Senate | 06/03/2015 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | House Calendar Number 688 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9318 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | File Number 748 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 441 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |