Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Public Health | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | File Number 444 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 278 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |