Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-222
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 665
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7616
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
File Number 212
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 171
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|