Senate | 06/04/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Public Act 15-17 | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 515 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | File Number 298 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 219 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |