Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Public Act 15-16 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 427 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | File Number 445 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 265 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |