Senate | 03/11/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |